VT JRS035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution condemning the continuing occurrence of street harassment in Vermont
Title
Joint resolution condemning the continuing occurrence of street harassment in Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2020-02-06 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2020-02-04 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption |
2020-01-28 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |