CO HB1452 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Pending: Senate Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning airport accessibility requirements.
Title
Airport Accessibility Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1452, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1452 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1452 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |