VA SB484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pediatric oral health benefits; reasonable assurance of provision. Declares that a health carrier that makes available in the small group market or individual market outside an exchange a health benefit plan issued for policy or plan years beginning on or after January 1, 2015, that does not include the required minimum essential pediatric oral health benefits shall be deemed to satisfy the requirement that the plan provide such coverage if the health carrier has obtained reasonable assurance that such pediatric oral health benefits are provided to the purchaser of the plan. The health carrier shall be deemed to have obtained such reasonable assurance that such benefits are provided to the purchaser if (i) at least one qualified dental plan offers the required benefits and is available for purchase by the small group or individual purchaser; and (ii) the health carrier prominently discloses that the plan does not provide the required benefits.
Title
Pediatric oral health; essential health benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 369 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB484ER) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB484S1 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104099D-S1 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104099D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102803D |
Same As/Similar To
HB33 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)