VA SB182 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Falls Church; qualifications of members of boards and commissions. Removes the requirement in the City of Falls Church charter that board and commission members be qualified voters, replacing it with an age requirement of at least 18 years old while leaving the city residence requirement.
Title
Falls Church, City of; amending charter, qualifications of members of boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #2 (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #2 (18-Y 22-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB182ER) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100781D |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
HB339 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
HB339 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor