VA SB140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public institutions of higher education; information related to pledges and donations. Provides that no discretionary exclusion in FOIA shall apply to protect information relating to the amount, date, purpose, and terms of a pledge or donation made to a public institution of higher education. The bill provides that the identity of the donor shall be protected only if (i) the donor has requested anonymity in connection with or as a condition of making a pledge or donation and (ii) the pledge or donation does not impose terms or conditions directing academic decision-making. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.
Title
FOIA; public higher educational institutions, information related to pledges and donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB140ER) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20100634D-E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB140E |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100634D |
Same As/Similar To
HB510 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)