VA HB848 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; recovery of costs of new underground distribution facilities. Authorizes investor-owned electric utilities to recover the costs of new underground distribution facilities through a rate adjustment clause. Eligible facilities will replace existing overhead distribution facilities of 69 kilovolts or less. Petitions seeking approval for recovery of such costs shall not be brought more frequently than annually. A utility shall not seek any annual incremental increase in the level of investments in such facilities that exceeds five percent of the utility's distribution rate base. In determining whether to approve a rate adjustment clause for such facilities, the State Corporation Commission is directed to liberally construe the provisions of Title 56 and to give due consideration to the public policy goals of increased electric service reliability and reduced outage times associated with the replacement of existing overhead distribution facilities with new underground facilities. None of the costs of such new facilities shall be allocated to customers in the large power service rate class for a Phase I utility or general service rate classes for a Phase II utility.
Title
Electric utility regulation; recovery of costs of new underground distribution facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB848ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2014-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102014D-E |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB848E |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102014D |