VA HB706 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative standing to defend laws of the Commonwealth. Provides that the General Assembly, the House of Delegates, the Senate of Virginia, or a member of the General Assembly has standing to represent the interests of the Commonwealth in a proceeding in which a provision of the Constitution of Virginia is contested or the constitutionality, legality, or application of a law established under legislative authority is at issue and the Governor and Attorney General choose not to defend the law.
Title
General Assembly member; legislative standing to defend laws of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 32-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB706H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-01-31 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2014-01-31 | House | Substitute by Delegate Marshall, R.G. agreed to 14104529D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104529D-H1 (Marshall, R.G.) |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee amendments rejected |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/14 14102264D |