CA SB1443 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8257 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
California Interagency Council on Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3633.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3428.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |