VA HB613 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Henrietta Lacks Commission; sunset date. Changes the sunset of the Henrietta Lacks Commission from July 1, 2026, to July 1, 2024.
Title
Henrietta Lacks Commission; changes sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB613ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101172D |