VA HB606 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Number of circuit and district court judges. Increases and decreases the number of circuit, general district, and juvenile court judges authorized for each judicial circuit and district in accordance with a study report issued by the National Center for State Courts. These adjustments are recommended by the Judicial Council and by the Committee on District Courts. The bill also requires the Chief Justice to designate any judge serving in a circuit or district where the number of authorized judges is reduced after July 1, 2014, to provide assistance to any other circuit or district.
Title
Judges; maximum number in circuit, general district, and juvenile courts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (23-Y 73-N) (Y: 23 N: 75 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 63-N) (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 63-N) (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (23-Y 73-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (23-Y 73-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB606ER) |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N) |
2014-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senators: Petersen, McDougle, Deeds |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Delegates: Miller, Jones, Joannou |
2014-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 63-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 14105189D-S1 (30-Y 63-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB606S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105189D-S1 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105189D-S1 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 36-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 36-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB606H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Pending question ordered |
2014-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cline rejected |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104717D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104717D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101810D |
Same As/Similar To
SB443 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0822)
Subjects
Courts Not of Record
Courts of Record
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Courts of Record
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports