VA HB465 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
University of Virginia Board of Visitors; executive committee. Increases from six to seven the maximum number of members of the University of Virginia Board of Visitors permitted to serve on the executive committee.
Title
University of Virginia Board of Visitors; increases number of members on executive committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB465ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100996D |