VA HB1452 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of agencies and their appointing authorities; diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans. Requires each state agency to submit its annual report assessing the impact of its diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans on the populations served by the agency and on the agency's workforce and budget to the General Assembly, in addition to the Governor, by July 1 of each year. Duties of agencies and their appointing authorities; diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans. Requires each state agency to submit its annual report assessing the impact of its diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans on the populations served by the agency and on the agency's workforce and budget to the General Assembly, in addition to the Governor, by July 1 of each year.
Title
State agencies and their appointing authorities; diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans.
Sponsors
Del. Alex Askew [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 4-N) (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1452ER) |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 40-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws (16-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105124D |