VA HB1416 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax assessment; appeal to circuit court. Provides that neither the taxpayer nor the locality shall have the burden of proof in an appeal of a real property assessment to the circuit court.
Title
Real property tax assessment; appeal to circuit court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2015-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101546D |