VA HB1373 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Legal notices; advertisement by locality. Allows localities with a population of 50,000 or greater to meet certain notice requirements by utilizing their websites, radio, or television instead of a newspaper of general circulation.
Title
Legal notices; advertisement by locality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (1-Y 10-N) (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (1-Y 10-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2012-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100973D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1378 (Similar To) 2013-01-18 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns