VA HB1053 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of the State Inspector General; powers and duties; internal auditors. Provides that the performance review of a state agency, nonstate agency, or independent contractor of a state agency conducted by the Office of the Inspector General include assessment of the effectiveness, efficiency, or economy of the agency's programs. The bill gives the State Inspector General the discretion to refer certain complaints to the internal audit department of public institutions of higher education. The bill provides that the State Inspector General may provide assistance for investigations as may be requested by the public institution of higher education. In addition, the bill exempts from mandatory disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act the investigative notes, correspondence and information furnished in confidence, and records otherwise exempted by law that are provided to or produced by or for internal auditors appointed by the head of a state agency or the board of visitors of a public institution of higher education. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
State Inspector General, Office of; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 788 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1053ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1053ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1053H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104450D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB287 |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104450D-H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14102966D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 309.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 309.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |