VA HB1003 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; precincts and polling places; notice of changes mailed at least 30 days prior to election. Requires notice of any adopted change in an election district, precinct, or polling place to be mailed to all registered voters subject to such change at least 30 days prior to the next election. Currently, such notice must be mailed at least 15 days prior.
Title
Precincts and polling places; notice of changes mailed at least 30 days prior to election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1003ER) |
2024-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103845D |