UT SB0151 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Religious Freedom Instruction Requirements
Title
Religious Freedom Instruction Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Stuart Reid [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2014-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0151.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0151.pdf |