US SB982 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Became Public Law No: 113-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Became Public Law No: 113-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Freedom to Fish Act - Requires the Chief of the Army Corps of Engineers to: (1) cease implementing and enforcing, until two years after enactment of this Act, any restricted area for hazardous waters at dams and other civil works structures in the Cumberland River Basin that the Chief established or modified between August 1, 2012, and the day before the enactment of this Act; and (2) remove any permanent physical barriers constructed in connection with such area. Requires the Chief, before establishing any such restricted area after this Act's enactment, to: (1) ensure that any restrictions are based on operational conditions that create hazardous waters, and (2) publish and seek and consider public comment on a draft describing the restricted area. Prohibits the Chief from: (1) implementing or enforcing the restricted area until two years after this Act's enactment, or (2) taking any action to establish a permanent physical barrier in connection with such area. (Excludes the installation and maintenance of measures for alerting the public of hazardous water conditions as such a permanent physical barrier.) Makes enforcement of a restricted area the sole responsibility of the state in which such area is located. Prohibits the Chief from assessing any penalty for entering a restricted area of public park and recreational facilities at water resource development projects.
Title
Freedom to Fish Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-13. |
2013-06-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2013-05-22 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2825) |
2013-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 982. |
2013-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2825-2827) |
2013-05-21 | House | Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2013-05-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3584-3585; text as passed Senate: CR S3585) |
Same As/Similar To
SB601 (Related) 2013-10-31 - See also H.R. 3080.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Army Corps of Engineers
Dams and canals
Department of Defense
Hunting and fishing
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Tennessee
Army Corps of Engineers
Dams and canals
Department of Defense
Hunting and fishing
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Tennessee