US HB1042 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the importation into the United States of unirradiated low-enriched uranium that is produced in the Russian Federation, and for other purposes.
Title
Prohibiting Russian Uranium Imports Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2023-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1042. |
2023-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-12-11 | House | Mrs. Rodgers (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-12-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 240. |
2023-12-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-296. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 21. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 12 . |
2023-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB763 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.