US SB898 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-190.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2013 - Directs the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to offer to convey to the Amy Biehl High School Foundation certain federal lands located in Albuquerque, New Mexico. Requires such conveyance to be in accordance with a fair market value appraisal that is acceptable to the Administrator. Makes the Foundation responsible for the costs related to such conveyance. Requires the conveyance to occur within three years of this Act's enactment.
Title
Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-190. |
2014-11-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-11-17 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-11-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7914) |
2014-11-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 898. |
2014-11-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7914-7915) |
2014-11-12 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-09-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5460-5461; text as passed Senate: CR S5461) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3998 (Related) 2014-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Elementary and secondary education
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources