US HB3998 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2014 - Directs the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to offer to convey to the Amy Biehl High School Foundation certain federal lands, including any improvements on such lands, located in Albuquerque, New Mexico. Requires such conveyance to be in accordance with a fair market value appraisal that is acceptable to the Administrator. Makes the Foundation responsible for the costs related to such conveyance. Requires the proceeds from such conveyance to be paid into the Federal Buildings Fund. Requires the conveyance to occur within three years of this Act's enactment.
Title
Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2014-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-06-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5380) |
2014-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3998. |
2014-06-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5380-5381) |
2014-06-17 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300. |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-408. |
2014-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB898 (Related) 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-190.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Elementary and secondary education
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources