US SB2714 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
World War I American Veterans Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) mint and issue $1 silver coins to commemorate the centennial of the involvement of the United States in World War I, and (2) hold a competition and provide compensation for its winner to design the obverse and reverse of the coins. Requires the design of such coins to be emblematic of the centennial of the involvement of the United States in World War I. Permits the Secretary to issue such coins only during the period beginning on January 1, 2018, and ending on December 31, 2018. Subjects the coin sales to a surcharge of $10 per coin, payable by the Secretary to the World War I Centennial Commission.
Title
World War I American Veterans Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2366 (Related) 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-212.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2714/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2714/BILLS-113s2714is.pdf |