US HB2366 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-212.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
World War I American Veterans Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) mint and issue $1 silver coins in commemoration of the centennial of America's involvement in World War I; and (2) hold a juried competition, and compensate its winner, for design of the obverse and reverse of the coins in a way emblematic of the centennial. Permits the use of only one facility of the U.S. Mint to strike any particular quality of the coins. Authorizes the Secretary to issue the coins only during calendar year 2018. Subjects coin sales to a surcharge of $10 per coin, payable by the Secretary to the United States Foundation for the Commemoration of the World Wars to assist the World War I Centennial Commission in the commemoration. Directs the Secretary to ensure that: (1) minting and issuing the coins will not result in any net cost to the government; and (2) no funds, including applicable surcharges, shall be disbursed to designated recipients until the total cost of designing and issuing the coins is recovered by the Treasury.
Title
World War I American Veterans Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 418 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-212. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6354) |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2014-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 3 (Roll no. 539). (text: CR H8255-8256) |
2014-12-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8261-8262) |
2014-12-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2366. |
2014-12-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8255-8258) |
2014-12-02 | House | Mr. Pearce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2714 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition