US SB2382 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Raises for Seniors Act - Directs the Bureau of Labor Statistics (BLS) of the Department of Labor to publish for each calendar month a Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers (CPI-E) that indicates the average change over time in the prices paid by individuals in the United States who are age 62 and older for a market basket of consumer goods and services. Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to make the CPI-E the applicable Consumer Price Index (CPI) for computation of cost-of-living increases in OASDI benefits for such individuals. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from wages for purposes of employment and self-employment taxes (under the Federal Insurance Contributions Act [FICA] for OASDI insurance): (1) any remuneration up to $250,000 of the amount of the contribution and benefit base, and (2) only so much of that remuneration that is less than $250,000. Amends SSA title II to include 1% or $1,000 (whichever is less) of surplus average indexed monthly earnings in the determination of primary OASDI amounts.
Title
Fair Raises for Seniors Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Related) 2013-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1029 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3118 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB308 (Related) 2013-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB500 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB567 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1029 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3118 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB308 (Related) 2013-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB500 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB567 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Aging
Employment taxes
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Prescription drugs
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Employment taxes
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Prescription drugs
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2382/BILLS-113s2382is.pdf |