US SB500 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Our Social Security Promises Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to apply employment and self-employment taxes to remuneration up to the contribution and benefit base and to remuneration in excess of $250,000.
Title
Keeping Our Social Security Promises Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1029 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2382 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5306 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2382 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5306 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5852 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/500/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s500/BILLS-113s500is.pdf |