US SB2003 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the energy tax credit to solar energy, fuel cell, microturbine, combined heat and power system, small wind energy, and thermal energy properties the construction of which begins before January 1, 2017.
Title
Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2502 (Related) 2013-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3017 (Related) 2013-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5559 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
HB3017 (Related) 2013-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5559 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2003/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2003/BILLS-113s2003is.pdf |