US HB2502 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 111-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the energy tax credit to solar energy, fuel cell, microturbine, combined heat and power system, small wind energy, and thermal energy properties the construction of which begins before January 1, 2017.
Title
Renewable Energy Parity Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3017 (Related) 2013-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB2003 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4956 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB5559 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
SB2003 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4956 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB5559 (Related) 2014-09-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1496)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2502/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2502/BILLS-113hr2502ih.pdf |