US HR995 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial of Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security.
Title
Appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial of Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-02-13 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 996, H. Res. 995 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H573; text: CR H573) |
2024-02-13 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 996, H. Res. 995 is considered passed House. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Accountability. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR996 (Related) 2024-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.