US HR644 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 93-2)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns and disapproves of the Obama administration's failure to comply with the lawful 30-day statutory reporting requirement in executing the transfer of five senior Taliban members from detention at U.S. Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Expresses concern over: (1) national security implications that may arise from the Taliban members' release, including the national security threat to the American people and the U.S. Armed Forces; and (2) the repercussions of negotiating with terrorists, and the risk that such negotiations may further encourage hostilities and the abduction of Americans. Stipulates that further violations of appropriate law are unacceptable. States that these actions have burdened the trust in the commitment and ability of the Obama administration to work with Congress. Expresses relief that Sergeant Bergdahl has returned safely to the United States.
Title
Condemning and disapproving of the failure of the Obama administration to comply with the lawful statutory requirement to notify Congress before transferring individuals detained at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, and expressing concern about the national security risks over the transfer of five Taliban leaders and the repercussions of negotiating with terrorists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-09 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 249 N: 163 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-09 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 163 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H7325) |
2014-09-09 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7334-7335) |
2014-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 644. |
2014-09-09 | House | Resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 5078 and specified amendments are in order. A motion to recommit with or without instructions is also in order. Resolution provides for one hour of debate on H. Res. 644 and allows a motion to recommit, with or without instructions. |
2014-09-09 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 715. (consideration: CR H7325-7335) |
2014-09-09 | House | Rule H. Res. 715 passed House. |
2014-09-08 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 715 Reported to House. Resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 5078 and specified amendments are in order. A motion to recommit with or without instructions is also in order. Resolution provides for one hour of debate on H. Res. 644 and allows a motion to recommit, with or without instructions. |
2014-07-31 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 133. |
2014-07-31 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Armed Services. H. Rept. 113-569. |
2014-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HR715 (Related) 2014-09-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Congressional-executive branch relations
Cuba
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Presidents and presidential powers
Terrorism
Caribbean area
Congressional-executive branch relations
Cuba
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Presidents and presidential powers
Terrorism