US HR600 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5106-5107)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5106-5107)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the government of Afghanistan for holding a successful first round of the presidential election and expresses support for a credible second round on June 14, 2014. Supports the mandate of Afghan electoral bodies such as the Independent Election Commission (IEC) and the Electoral Complaints Commission (ECC) to administer polls to prevent fraud and misconduct. Encourages the government of Afghanistan to implement measures that will increase voter participation, particularly among the Afghan female population. Recognizes the determination of the Afghan people to exercise their right to vote and determine their country's destiny. Urges the government of Afghanistan to assure that fraudulent electoral activities do not take place during the runoff. Urges the IEC to better mitigate fraud, improve electoral transparency, and communicate these measures to the people of Afghanistan. Urges: (1) communication between the IEC and the Afghanistan National Security Forces (ANSF) to provide security for vulnerable areas of the country during the election period; and (2) the ANSF to ensure the safety of voters, candidates, poll workers, and election observers. Encourages all elements of Afghan society to refrain from fomenting disturbances in voting areas. Supports the full participation of Afghan civil society in the election process. Recognizes that a democratically-elected government that reflects the will of the Afghan people and is committed to combating terrorism would promote the long-term stability and security interests of Afghanistan, its neighbors, and its partners in the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) International Security Assistance Force, including the United States. Recognizes the sacrifices of U.S. and coalition armed forces to Afghanistan's security and stability.
Title
Urging the Government of Afghanistan, following a successful first round of the presidential election on April 5, 2014, to pursue a transparent, credible, and inclusive run-off presidential election on June 14, 2014, while ensuring the safety of voters, candidates, poll workers, and election observers.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5106-5107) |
2014-06-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 600. |
2014-06-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5106-5108) |
2014-06-09 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2014-05-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Terrorism
Voting rights
Women's rights
Asia
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Human rights
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Political movements and philosophies
Terrorism
Voting rights
Women's rights