US HB573 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Conveys to the government of the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands submerged lands surrounding such Islands and extending three geographical miles outward from their coastlines. Includes the Northern Mariana Islands among the islands where the President may establish naval defensive sea areas and airspace reservations when necessary for national defense.
Title
To amend Public Law 93-435 with respect to the Northern Mariana Islands, providing parity with Guam, the Virgin Islands, and American Samoa.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2633) |
2013-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 573. |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2633-2634) |
2013-05-15 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 34. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-56. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-02-06 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E106-107) |
Same As/Similar To
SB256 (Same As) 2013-09-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-34.
HB2200 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB2200 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Northern Mariana Islands
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. territories and protectorates
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Northern Mariana Islands
Oil and gas
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. territories and protectorates