US HB5629 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Domestic Nuclear Security Act of 2014 - Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Director for Domestic Nuclear Detection: (1) in carrying out the mission of the Domestic Nuclear Detention Office, to provide support for planning, organization, equipment, training, exercises, and operational assessments to federal, state, local, territorial, and tribal entities to assist in implementing radiological and nuclear detection capabilities in the event of a radiological or nuclear act of terror or other attack; and (2) to establish the Securing the Cities (STC) program to enhance the ability of the United States to detect and prevent a radiological or nuclear act of terror or other attack in high-risk urban areas.
Title
Strengthening Domestic Nuclear Security Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 374 N: 11 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-12-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 11 (Roll no. 532). (text: CR H8192) |
2014-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8198) |
2014-12-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-12-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5629. |
2014-12-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8192-8194) |
2014-12-01 | House | Mr. Meehan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-10-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Crime prevention
Emergency planning and evacuation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development