US HB4139 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts the boundary of the Palo Alto Battlefield National Historical Park in Texas to include the approximately 166.44 acres of land identified on the map titled "PALO ALTO BATTLEFIELD NATIONAL HISTORICAL PARK Proposed Boundary Addition, Fort Brown Unit" (2018), when the land is donated to the United States.
Title
To provide for the boundary of the Palo Alto Battlefield National Historic Park to be adjusted, to authorize the donation of land to the United States for addition to that historic park, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 526. |
2020-12-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-641. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Mexico
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Mexico
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Texas