US HB4080 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize appropriations for trauma care programs through FY2019. Requires that not more than 50% of amounts remaining for a fiscal year after FY2014 (after allocation for administrative purposes or for improvement of emergency medical services in rural areas) be allocated for competitive grants to support pilot projects for emergency care and trauma systems. Requires the inclusion of standards and requirements of the American Burn Association in trauma care modifications of a state plan for providing emergency medical services.
Title
Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2014-06-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5693-5694) |
2014-06-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4080. |
2014-06-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5693-5695) |
2014-06-24 | House | Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340. |
2014-05-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-459. |
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2014-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2014-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2405 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 481.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding