US HB3931 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Health Insurance Protection (CHIP) Act - Amends XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act with respect to the income level of certain children born after September 30, 1983 (or, at the option of a state, after any earlier date), who are between 6 and 19 years of age. Maintains the income level at 100% of the income official poverty line applicable to a family of the size involved by repealing the increase to 113% of the poverty line scheduled to begin January 1, 2014.
Title
Children's Health Insurance Protection (CHIP) Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3931/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3931/BILLS-113hr3931ih.pdf |