US HB3892 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-18)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-18)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 8771 Auburn Folsom Road in Roseville, California, as the "Lance Corporal Victor A. Dew Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 8771 Auburn Folsom Road in Roseville, California, as the "Lance Corporal Victor A. Dew Post Office".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-247. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8454) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2012-11-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2012-11-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-11-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6480) |
2012-11-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3892. |
2012-11-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6480-6482) |
2012-11-28 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-02-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2012-02-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H378-379) |
Subjects
California
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service