US HB3615 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Careers for Heroes Act - Directs the head of each federal agency other than the Department of Defense (DOD) and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop a plan for exercising, during the five-year period beginning on the enactment of this Act, authority to make veterans recruitment appointments and authority under the Veterans Employment Opportunities Act of 1998. Requires the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to ensure that, under such plans, agencies shall appoint no less than 15,000 qualified covered veterans during such period. (Covered veterans include those who: (1) are disabled or recently separated; (2) served on active duty during a war or in a campaign or expedition for which a campaign badge has been authorized; or (3) while serving on active duty, participated in a military operation for which an Armed Forces service medal was awarded.)
Title
Careers for Heroes Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-11-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB495 (Related) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB944 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 258.
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3615/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3615/BILLS-113hr3615ih.pdf |