US HB3541 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Obamacare Taxpayer Bailout Prevention Act - Repeals the provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish and administer a program of risk corridors for calendar years 2014, 2015, and 2016 under which a qualified health plan offered in the individual or small group market is required to participate in a payment adjustment system based on the ratio of the allowable costs of the plan to the plan's aggregate premiums.
Title
Obamacare Taxpayer Bailout Prevention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1726 (Same As) 2013-11-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4354 (Related) 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2214 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4354 (Related) 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2214 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3541/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3541/BILLS-113hr3541ih.pdf |