US HB3326 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trinity County Land Exchange Act of 2014 - Provides for the exchange of approximately 47 acres of land known as the Sky Ranch Parcel and owned by the Trinity Public Utilities District of Trinity County, California, for approximately 100 acres of land in the Shasta-Trinity National Forest near the Weaverville Airport in Trinity County. Intends for such land exchange to be an equal value exchange. Provides for cash equalization if the parcels are not of equal value. Requires the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to administer the Sky Ranch parcel as public land, except that public recreation and public access to and for recreation shall be the highest and best use of such parcel.
Title
Trinity County Land Exchange Act of 2014'.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7949) |
2014-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3326. |
2014-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7949-7950) |
2014-11-13 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-11-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457. |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-615. |
2014-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-09-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
Subjects
California
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Public utilities and utility rates
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Public utilities and utility rates