US HB3027 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-247.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 442 Miller Valley Road in Prescott, Arizona, as the "Barry M. Goldwater Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 442 Miller Valley Road in Prescott, Arizona, as the "Barry M. Goldwater Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ron Barber [D-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-247. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6841) |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6158) |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3027. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6158) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-05-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Arizona
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Postal service
Senate
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Postal service
Senate