US HB2788 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage Forgiveness Tax Relief Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2015 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence.
Title
Mortgage Forgiveness Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2994 (Related) 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1187 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3856 (Related) 2014-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5785 (Related) 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1187 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3856 (Related) 2014-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5785 (Related) 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2788/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2788/BILLS-113hr2788ih.pdf |