US HB1876 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stability to Ensure the American Dream for Youth Act - Amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend the 3.4% interest rate on Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students between July 1, 2011, and July 1, 2013, to Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students before July 1, 2017.
Title
Stability to Ensure the American Dream for Youth Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] |
Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1433 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB1498 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB1595 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB682 (Related) 2013-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB707 (Related) 2013-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1498 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB1595 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB682 (Related) 2013-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB707 (Related) 2013-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1876/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1876/BILLS-113hr1876ih.pdf |