US HB1691 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 89.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 89.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chocolate Mountain Aerial Gunnery Range Transfer Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to transfer to the Secretary of the Navy administrative jurisdiction over certain public lands in Imperial and Riverside Counties, California, for inclusion within the Chocolate Mountain Aerial Gunnery Range. Withdraws the mineral estate of such land from all forms of appropriation under the public land laws, including the mining laws and the mineral and geothermal leasing laws, for as long as the land is under the administrative jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Navy. Requires the Secretary of the Navy to prepare an integrated natural resources management plan with respect to the transferred lands. Requires the Secretary of the Navy, upon determining that there is no longer a military need for the lands transferred, to transfer such lands back to the Secretary of the Interior. Requires appropriate land decontamination preceding the retransfer. Amends the California Military Lands Withdrawal and Overflights Act of 1994 to extend a land withdrawal and reservation period consistent with the above transfer. Provides that nothing in this Act shall affect existing water rights on the transferred lands.
Title
Chocolate Mountain Aerial Gunnery Range Transfer Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 89. |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2013-06-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-124, Part I. |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2013-04-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
California
Firearms and explosives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Firearms and explosives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources