US HB1168 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior, if an offer is received from the city of Carlin, Nevada, to purchase certain federal land within the city, through the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), to convey to the city all interest of the United States in such land in exchange for consideration equal to the fair market value of the land. Permits the city to pay or reimburse the Secretary, as appropriate, for reasonable transaction and administrative personnel costs associated with such conveyance. Prohibits a conveyance or combination of conveyances under this Act from being considered a major federal action under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969. Releases the United States from all liabilities or claims of any kind or nature arising from the presence, release, or threat of release of any hazardous substance, pollutant, contaminant, petroleum product (or derivative of a petroleum product) solid waste, mine materials, or mining related features existing on the federal land. Withdraws the federal land identified for conveyance from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Bureau of Land Management, to convey to the City of Carlin, Nevada, in exchange for consideration, all right, title, and interest of the United States, to any Federal land within that city that is under the jurisdiction of that agency, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160. |
2013-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-220. |
2013-07-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-31 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5205 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.