TX SB2 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the ad valorem tax system.
Title
Relating to the administration of the ad valorem tax system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-19 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-18 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
PROPERTY TAX ADMINISTRATION ADVISORY BOARD
PROPERTY TAX PAYER EMPOWERMENT ACT OF 2017
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
TEXAS PROPERTY TAX REFORM AND RELIEF ACT OF 2017
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--General
Electronic Information Systems
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
PROPERTY TAX ADMINISTRATION ADVISORY BOARD
PROPERTY TAX PAYER EMPOWERMENT ACT OF 2017
Taxation
Taxation--General
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
TEXAS PROPERTY TAX REFORM AND RELIEF ACT OF 2017