TX SB1752 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to declarations for mental health treatment.
Title
Relating to declarations for mental health treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |