TX HB530 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of proceeds from criminal asset forfeiture to provide college scholarships to children of peace officers killed in the line of duty and to an annual report regarding the total value of forfeited property in this state.
Title
Relating to the use of proceeds from criminal asset forfeiture to provide college scholarships to children of peace officers killed in the line of duty and to an annual report regarding the total value of forfeited property in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 530Third Reading House (Y: 127 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 530Third Reading House (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 530Third Reading House (Y: 115 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Amended |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Law Enforcement
SCHOLARSHIPS
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Law Enforcement
SCHOLARSHIPS