TX HB3941 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Comal County Water Improvement District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Comal County Water Improvement District No. 3; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-27 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-19 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-04-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMAL COUNTY WATER IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 3
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.