TX HB364 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-21 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the child support obligation of an obligor during the obligor's confinement in jail or prison.
Title
Relating to the child support obligation of an obligor during the obligor's confinement in jail or prison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - HB 364Third Reading House (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-24 | House | Filed |