TX HB3263 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of firearm safety instruction in the required health curriculum for public school students.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of firearm safety instruction in the required health curriculum for public school students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Weapons